+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin
- Returned to Committee of Origin - Committee on Judiciary AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Read Second Time
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
- Reported for Introduction - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted to Introduce
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Authorized - Delivered to the Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor