+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled