+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 2, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 5
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 141 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 1
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 7
- HCS Adopted
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled