+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled