+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 2., 2013, 9:30AM, PERSHING GALLERY
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 1, 2013, 8:00AM, SCR 1
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 135 NOES: 17
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - HPA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 139 NOES: 13
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5 ADOPTED AYES: 141 NOES: 14
- HCS Adopted
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability
- Read Second Time
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (7)
1991H03.09H
Adopted
1991H03.02H
Adopted
1991H03.03H
Adopted
1991H03.01F
Distributed
1991H03.06H
Adopted
1991H03.07H
Adopted
1991H03.05H
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor