+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
- Public Hearing Held - MONDAY, MAY 9, 2011, 230PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 117 NOES: 32
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - RECONSIDERATION OF VOTE TO DO PASS
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Financial Institutions
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time