+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor