+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor