+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass Consent
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, March 27, 2019, 10:30 a.m. or upon morning recess, SCR 1
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Health and Pensions
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 138 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 0
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Pensions
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled