+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor