+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Public Safety
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
1750H02.07H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor