+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor