+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On April 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker Pro Tem
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 1
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Returned to Committee of Origin
- Removed from Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 12, 2011 9:00 AM - SENATE LOUNGE
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Progress and Development
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 0
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor