+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor