+ − Actions (22)
On June 8, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Judiciary
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Defeated
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 005
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 6, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Public Safety, Law Enforcement,Veteran Affairs
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor