+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Pensions
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
1468H02.01H
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor