+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Pensions
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor