+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Spec Com on Professional Registration & Licens
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor