+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Veterans
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time