+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Tuesday, April 23, 2019, 3:00pm, Bingham Conference Room
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 16, 2019, 1:00pm, SCR 1
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Veterans and Military Affairs
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
- Perfected
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time