+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 23, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Lounge
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Social Services
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
1570H01.03H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor