+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor