+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 26, 2011, 12:00PM, SCR 1
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 102 NOES: 51
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected - AYES: 99 NOES: 53
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor