+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time