+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 4, 2007, 1:30PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 27
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Veterans
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 4, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled