+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time