+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 30, 2005 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor