+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - No Action Taken
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Education Reform
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time