+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion Withdrawn - Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 124 NOES: 30
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 122 NOES: 32
- Emergency Clause Defeated - AYES: 3 NOES: 153
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report - REQUEST ROLL CALL TO BRING THE CCR BEFORE THE BODY. MOTION PASSED AYES: 31 NOES: 3
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES ZERR, KRATKY, JONES
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS SCHMITT, RICHARD, KRAUS, JUSTUS, MCKENNA
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 30, 9:30 AM, Senate Lounge
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 22 NOES: 11
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 29 NOES: 5
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 24, 2013, 12:00PM, OR UPON MORNING RECESS, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 113 NOES: 43
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7, HA 8, ADOPTED AYES: 120 NOES: 31
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- HCS #2 Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS #2 Voted Do Pass
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
- Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: Economic Development
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (26)
1838H07.43H
Distributed
1838H07.01H
Adopted
1838H07.03L
Distributed
1838H07.04H
Distributed
1838H07.04L
Distributed
1838H07.05H
Distributed
1838H07.05L
Distributed
1838H07.06H
Distributed
1838H07.06L
Defeated
1838H07.12H
Distributed
1838H07.13H
Distributed
1838H07.16H
Distributed
1838H07.22H
Distributed
1838H07.23H
Distributed
1838H07.27H
Distributed
1838H07.30H
Adopted
1838H07.31H
Distributed
1838H07.34H
Adopted
1838H07.35H
Adopted
1838H07.37H
Adopted
1838H07.38H
Distributed
1838H07.40H
Adopted
1838H07.42H
Adopted
1838H13.01F
Distributed
1838H07.01F
Adopted
1838S10.01F
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor