+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Corrections
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 18, 2012 in the House:
- Prefiled