+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 16, 2009 8:30A.M. SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Government Accountability &Fisc Oversght
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 0
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2009 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2008 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor