+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor