+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: General Laws
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 109 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 102 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1,HA 2.HA 4, HA 1 to HA 5, HA 2 to HA 5, HA 3 to HA 5,, HA 5 as amended, HA 6, HA 1 to HA 7, HA 7 as amended, adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (34)
0276H02.45H
Distributed
0276H02.42H
Defeated
0276H02.41H
Distributed
0276H02.40H
Adopted
0276H02.39H
Adopted
0276H02.37H
Defeated
0276H02.36H
Distributed
0276H02.35H
Adopted
0276H02.34H
Adopted
0276H02.32H
Adopted
0276H02.31H
Distributed
0276H02.28H
Adopted
0276H02.27H
Distributed
0276H02.26H
Adopted
0276H02.25H
Adopted
0276H02.22H
Distributed
0276H02.21H
Distributed
0276H02.16H
Adopted
0276H02.20H
Distributed
0276H02.19H
Distributed
0276H02.18H
Distributed
0276H02.17H
Distributed
0276H02.15H
Distributed
0276H02.12H
Distributed
0276H02.11H
Adopted
0276H02.10H
Adopted
0276H02.09H
Distributed
0276H02.08H
Adopted
0276H02.06H
Distributed
0276H02.05H
Adopted
0276H02.04H
Distributed
0276H02.03H
Distributed
0276H02.02H
Distributed
0276H02.01H
Defeated
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor