+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time