+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
- Public Hearing Held
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 4, 2017, 12:00pm or upon noon recess, Senate Lounge
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Economic Development
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (5)
1268H02.07H
Distributed
1268H02.04H
Adopted
1268H02.06H
Distributed
1268H02.02H
Distributed
1268H02.03H
Distributed