+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On June 11, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Removed from Consent Calendar
- Returned to Committee of Origin
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 10, 2007, 10:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE
- Public Hearing Held
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Agriculture,Conservation,Parks&Tourism
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 107 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 2
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor