+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - NO TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On April 1, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor