+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, May 2, 2019, 8:20am, Senate Lounge
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
1086H02.02H
Adopted
1086H02.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor