+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 13, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 4, 2007, 1:30PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 4
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 139 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 4
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Tourism
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor