+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - NO TIME LIMIT
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor