+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Action Postponed
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor