+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time