+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken Away from Committee - inadvertently referred
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 6, 2017, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 12:00 p.m. or Upon Noon Recess, Senate Lounge
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Economic Development
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 122 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted AYES: 121 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 1
- Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to tax credits for contributions to maternity homes and pregnancy resource centers
- Taken Up
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time