+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 16, 2013, 9:30AM, SCR 1
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- SCS Voted Do Pass
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 8,2013, 12:00PM. OR UPON MORNING RECESS, SENATE LOUNGE
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 131 NOES: 26 PRESENT: 1
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HSA 1 FOR HA 3 ADOPTED
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (5)
1650L06.07L
Adopted
1650L06.01L
Adopted
1650L06.04H
Adopted
1650L06.05L
Substitute
1650L06.06L
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor