+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor