+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time