+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee: Downsizing State Government
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time