+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 12, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
- House Concurs - SS#2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 150 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- SS Withdrawn
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- Senate Substitute Offered - SS#2
- SS Adopted
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 ADOPTED/SS AS AMENDED PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered - SA 1 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 26, 2011, 12:30PM, PERSHING SIDE GALLERY
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 0
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
- Read Second Time
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor