+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
- Executive Session Completed
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time