+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 113 NOES: 47
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2009 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2008 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor